The smart way to improve grades

Comprehensive & curriculum aligned

Affordable pricing from £10/month

Arithmetic Mathematics Paper 1 in the Style of Key Stage 2 National Tests.

In this assessment, students will be able to complete a timed Arithmetic paper in the style of Key Stage 2 SATs.

'Arithmetic Mathematics Paper 1 in the Style of Key Stage 2 National Tests. ' worksheet

Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:   SATs Practice Papers

Curriculum subtopic:   Arithmetic Practice Papers

Difficulty level:  

Worksheet Overview

QUESTION 1 of 10

This is a practice Arithmetic paper in the style of a Key Stage 2 National Test.

 

This is an assessment with a variety of arithmetic questions.

Some are multiple-choice and some will require you to type in an answer.

 

In the real Key Stage 2 National Test, you will write your answers in a special test booklet, normally in a box or space.

You will also write your any workings out in the booklet.

 

At EdPlace, you will use the computer to enter your answers and you should use a pencil and paper to complete your workings.

You must not use a calculator. 

 

You should work quickly and carefully through the questions. 

 

The timer is set for 30 minutes for this practice paper, although you can keep working after the timer has run out.

 

There are 36 questions. This means that you should aim for no more than 1 minute per question and hopefully, as you become more confident, less than 1 minute.

 

All questions require you to choose an answer or type an answer in.

These questions will be marked automatically.

 

You may find it useful to have a pencil and paper on hand for some written methods.

 

You may find some of the questions difficult.

If you are struggling to answer a question do not waste time on it, but move onto the next question.

 

Disclaimer:

We have no affiliation to the Standards and Testing Agency (STA) and these questions represent our own unique content developed by EdPlace Key Stage 2 Maths authors.

None of the content displayed here has been supplied by the STA or any other third party suppliers.

Find the missing number:

? = 7500 + 65

Find the missing numbers:

273 = ? + 70 + ?

Find the missing number:

? = 5235 + 35

Calculate:

71 × 9 = ?

Calculate:

270 ÷ 30 = ?

Calculate:

20 × 30 × 40 = ?

Calculate:

30 × 21 × 100 = ?

Calculate:

83 × 7 = ?

Calculate:

76 × 4 = ?

Calculate: 

7.9 - 3.27 = ?

Calculate:

5 - 1.99 = ?

Calculate:

2.54 - 1.83 = ?

Calculate:

364 ÷ 7 = ?

Calculate:

4892 ÷ 6 = ?

Show any remainders in the second box.

Find the missing number:

5.7 × ? = 5700

 

Calculate:

1020 ÷ 100 = ?

 

Calculate:

(7 + 25) ÷ (2 × 4) = ?

Calculate:

(8 × 3) ÷ (-3 + 11) = ?

Calculate:

2² × 9 = ?

Calculate: 

3³ × 100 = ?

Calculate:

25% of 364

Calculate:

20% of 365

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer as a mixed number in its simplest form.

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer in its simplest form.

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer as a mixed number in its simplest form. 

Calculate:

 

Calculate:

¾ of 240

Calculate:

 

Calculate:

 

Calculate:

 

7.9 × 3 = ?

Calculate: 

0.25 × 8 = ?

Calculate:

0.32 × 12 = ?

Calculate: 

 

Calculate:

 

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer with any remainders in the second box. 

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer with any remainders in the second box. 

  • Question 1

Find the missing number:

? = 7500 + 65

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The missing number is 7565. This question tests your understanding of place value. The digits in 65 fit into the places being held by zeros in 7500.
  • Question 2

Find the missing numbers:

273 = ? + 70 + ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The missing numbers are 200 and 3. This question tests your knowledge of place value as the missing digits are in the hundreds and ones places.
  • Question 3

Find the missing number:

? = 5235 + 35

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The missing number is 5270. In this question, you really only need to add together 35 and 35 as it is only the tens and ones digits which change.
  • Question 4

Calculate:

71 × 9 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The missing number is 639. First, multiply by 10 as this is easily done mentally. 71 × 10 = 710 Then, subtract 71 from 710. 710 - 71 = 639
  • Question 5

Calculate:

270 ÷ 30 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 9. 3 × 9 = 27 So, 30 × 9 = 270
  • Question 6

Calculate:

20 × 30 × 40 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 24000. 20 × 30 = 600 600 × 40 = 24000 You can use basic times tables facts (2 × 3 × 4) and place value to work this one out.
  • Question 7

Calculate:

30 × 21 × 100 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 63000. 30 × 21 is ten times larger than 3 × 21. 3 ×, 21 = 63 63 × 10 = 630 Multiply by 100 by moving all the digits 2 places to the left.
  • Question 8

Calculate:

83 × 7 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
581
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 581. Short multiplication is the best way to solve this calculation.
  • Question 9

Calculate:

76 × 4 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
304
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 304. Short multiplication is the best way to solve this calculation.
  • Question 10

Calculate: 

7.9 - 3.27 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 4.63. We work out 7.90 - 3.27, remembering to set the subtraction out in columns. We need to borrow from the 9 to make 10 in the units column, before subtracting the 7.
  • Question 11

Calculate:

5 - 1.99 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 3.01. First, subtract 2 from 5 getting 3. Then add back on 0.01 as 1.99 is 0.01 less than 2.
  • Question 12

Calculate:

2.54 - 1.83 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 0.71. The easiest way to solve this question is by using column subtraction, taking care to line up the digits correctly.
  • Question 13

Calculate:

364 ÷ 7 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 52. Short division is the simplest way to solve this problem. 7 does not fit into 3, so carry the 3 over and fill the hundreds space with a zero. 7 fits into 36 five times with 1 leftover. 7 fits into 14 twice.
  • Question 14

Calculate:

4892 ÷ 6 = ?

Show any remainders in the second box.

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 815 r2. Using short division (sometimes known as 'bus stop' method): 4 cannot be divided by 6 so we carry the 4 over. 48 can be divided by 6, giving 8. 9 divided by 6 is 1 with 3 to carry over. 32 divided by 6 is 5 remainder 2.
  • Question 15

Find the missing number:

5.7 × ? = 5700

 

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The missing number is 1000. When we multiply by 1000, we move each digit three places to the left. 5.7 becomes 5700.
  • Question 16

Calculate:

1020 ÷ 100 = ?

 

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 10.2. When we divide by 100, we move each digit two places to the right. 1020 becomes 10.2.
  • Question 17

Calculate:

(7 + 25) ÷ (2 × 4) = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 4. First, solve both pairs of brackets. 7 + 25 = 32 2 × 4 = 8 Next, complete the calculation. 32 ÷ 8 = 4
  • Question 18

Calculate:

(8 × 3) ÷ (-3 + 11) = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 3. First, solve the brackets. 8 × 3 = 24 -3 + 11 = 8 Next, complete the calculation. 24 ÷ 8 = 3
  • Question 19

Calculate:

2² × 9 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 36. 2² means two squared. 2 × 2 = 4 4 × 9 = 36
  • Question 20

Calculate: 

3³ × 100 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 2700. 3³ means 3 cubed. 3 × 3 × 3 = 27 27 × 100 = 2700
  • Question 21

Calculate:

25% of 364

CORRECT ANSWER
91
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 91. 25% is the same as 1/4, so the easiest way to find 25% is to simply divide by 4. 364 ÷ 4 = 91
  • Question 22

Calculate:

20% of 365

CORRECT ANSWER
73
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 73. There are two ways to work this out: Method 1 10% of 365 is 36.5 20% of 365 is 2 × 36.5 = 73 Method 2 20% is the same as 1/5, so just divide by 5. 365 ÷ 5 = 73
  • Question 23

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer as a mixed number in its simplest form.

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 1 1/6. First, make the two fractions into equivalent fractions with denominators of 24. 4/8 = 12/24 2/3 = 16/24 Then, add the two fractions. 12/24 + 16/24 = 28/24 Lastly, make the answer into a mixed number and simplify. 28/24 = 1 4/24 1 4/24 = 1 1/6
  • Question 24

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer in its simplest form.

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 3/20. First, make equivalent fractions with the denominator 20. 1/5 = 4/20 Then, subtract one fraction from another. 7/20 - 4/20 = 3/20 The fraction 3/20 cannot be simplified.
  • Question 25

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer as a mixed number in its simplest form. 

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 1 1/5. 3 whole ones can be shown as a fraction like this: 3/1. To multiply fractions, simply multiply the numerators, then the denominators. 2/5 × 3/1 = 6/5 6/5 can be converted in the mixed number 1 1/5.
  • Question 26

Calculate:

 

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 7/48. To divide fractions, we keep the first fraction the same, change the operation to multiply and flip the second fraction upside down. 7/12 × 4/1 becomes 7/12 × 1/4 = 7/48 7/48 cannot be simplified.
  • Question 27

Calculate:

¾ of 240

CORRECT ANSWER
180
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 180. To find one quarter, we divide by 4. ¼ of 240 = 240 ÷ 4 = 60 To find three quarters we triple the quarter. ¾ of 240 = 3 × 60 = 180
  • Question 28

Calculate:

 

CORRECT ANSWER
42
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 42. To find one third, we divide the number by 3. 63 ÷ by 3 = 21 Two-thirds is double this. 21 × 2 = 42
  • Question 29

Calculate:

 

CORRECT ANSWER
560
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 560. One-eighth of 64 is 8 So, one-eighth of 640 is 80. Seven eights is 7 times this amount. 7 × 8 = 56 So, 7 × 80 = 560
  • Question 30

Calculate:

 

7.9 × 3 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 23.7. We can work out that 79 × 3 = 237. So, 7.9 × 3 = 23.7
  • Question 31

Calculate: 

0.25 × 8 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 2. Knowledge of fractions and decimal equivalence can help you here! 0.25 is the same as 1/4. 1/4 of 8 is 2.
  • Question 32

Calculate:

0.32 × 12 = ?

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 0.32. 3 × 12 = 36 0.3 × 12 = 3.6 2 × 12 = 24 0.02 × 12 = 0.24 3.6 + 0.24 = 3.84
  • Question 33

Calculate: 

 

CORRECT ANSWER
20538
20,538
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 20538. Long multiplication is the best way to solve this problem.
  • Question 34

Calculate:

 

CORRECT ANSWER
2376
2,376
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 2376. Long multiplication is the best way to solve this question.
  • Question 35

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer with any remainders in the second box. 

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 594 remainder 6. Long division is ideal for solving this tricky calculation. Writing out multiples of 14 before you start is a great, time-saving technique!
  • Question 36

Calculate:

 

 

Show your answer with any remainders in the second box. 

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
The answer is 74 remainder 12. Long division is the way to solve this one. To save time and ensure accuracy, write out the multiples of 15 before you start.
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started
laptop

Start your £1 trial today.
Subscribe from £10/month.