The smart way to improve grades

Comprehensive & curriculum aligned

Affordable pricing from £10/month

Multiply Two Three-Digit Numbers

In this worksheet, student multiply two three-digit numbers using a column method.

'Multiply Two Three-Digit Numbers' worksheet

Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:  Number: Addition, Subtraction, Multiplication and Division

Curriculum subtopic:  Multiply to Four Digits (Long Multiplication)

Difficulty level:  

Worksheet Overview

QUESTION 1 of 10

In this worksheet, we will learn how to multiply together two three-digit numbers using a column method.

 

For Example:

Find the product of 333 and 421.

 

  × 333
421
   
333 × 400 133200
333 × 20 6660
333 × 1 333
   
  140193
 

Find this product

989 × 537 = _______

Find this product

411 × 395 = _______

Find this product

296 × 727 = _______

Find this product

360 × 143 = _______

Find this product

287 × 665 = _______

Find this product

296 × 565 = _______

Find this product

439 × 582 = _______

Work out the value of

228 × 249 = _______

Work out

660 × 795 = _______

Work out the product of 809 and 547

809 × 547 = _______

  • Question 1

Find this product

989 × 537 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
531093
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 989 x 500 = 494500 Step 2: 989 x 30 = 29670 Step 3: 989 x 7 = 6923 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 531093.
  • Question 2

Find this product

411 × 395 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
162345
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 411 x 300 = 123300 Step 2: 411 x 90 = 36990 Step 3: 411 x 5 = 2055 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 162345.
  • Question 3

Find this product

296 × 727 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
215192
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 296 x 700 = 207200 Step 2: 296 x 20 = 5920 Step 3: 296 x 7 = 2072 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 215192.
  • Question 4

Find this product

360 × 143 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
51480
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 360 x 100 = 36000 Step 2: 360 x 40 = 14400 Step 3: 360 x 3 = 1080 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 51480.
  • Question 5

Find this product

287 × 665 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
190855
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 287 x 600 = 172200 Step 2: 287 x 60 = 17220 Step 3: 287 x 5 = 1435 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 190855.
  • Question 6

Find this product

296 × 565 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
167240
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 296 x 500 = 148000 Step 2: 296 x 60 = 17760 Step 3: 296 x 5 = 1480 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 167240.
  • Question 7

Find this product

439 × 582 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
255498
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 439 x 500 = 219500 Step 2: 439 x 80 = 35120 Step 3: 439 x 2 = 878 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 255498.
  • Question 8

Work out the value of

228 × 249 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
56772
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 228 x 200 = 45600 Step 2: 228 x 40 = 9120 Step 3: 228 x 9 = 2052 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 56772.
  • Question 9

Work out

660 × 795 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
524700
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 660 x 700 = 462000 Step 2: 660 x 90 = 59400 Step 3: 660 x 5 = 3300 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 524700.
  • Question 10

Work out the product of 809 and 547

809 × 547 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
442523
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 809 x 500 = 404500 Step 2: 809 x 40 = 32360 Step 3: 809 x 7 = 5663 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 442523.
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started
laptop

Start your £1 trial today.
Subscribe from £10/month.