 # Multiplying a 3-Digit Number by a 2-Digit Number

In this worksheet, students multiply a 3-digit number by a 2-digit number. Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:   Maths and Numerical Reasoning

Curriculum subtopic:   Mixed Problems

Difficulty level:   ### QUESTION 1 of 10

In this worksheet you must multiply a 3-digit number by a 2-digit number.

This is done by long multiplication as follows.

Example

Work out 539 x 34

 × 5 3 9 3 4 539 × 4 2 1 5 6 539 × 30 1 6 1 7 0 1 8 3 2 6

Try the following problem yourself.

681 × 34 =

Work out

703 × 24 =

Work out

745 × 37 =

Multiply

696 × 28 =

Work out

339 × 22 =

Calculate

266 × 29 =

Work out

886 × 57 =

Work out

387 × 56 =

Multiply

308 × 93 =

Multiply

333 × 33 =

• Question 1

Try the following problem yourself.

681 × 34 =
23154
• Question 2

Work out

703 × 24 =

16872
• Question 3

Work out

745 × 37 =

27565
• Question 4

Multiply

696 × 28 =

19488
• Question 5

Work out

339 × 22 =

7458
• Question 6

Calculate

266 × 29 =

7714
• Question 7

Work out

886 × 57 =

50502
• Question 8

Work out

387 × 56 =

21672
• Question 9

Multiply

308 × 93 =

28644
• Question 10

Multiply

333 × 33 =

10989
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

### What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started 