The smart way to improve grades

Comprehensive & curriculum aligned

Affordable pricing from £10/month

Long Multiplication

In this worksheet, students find the product of two two-digit numbers.

'Long Multiplication' worksheet

Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:   Number: Multiplication and Division

Curriculum subtopic:   Multiply Numbers to Four Digits

Difficulty level:  

Worksheet Overview

QUESTION 1 of 10

In this activity, we will learn about long multiplication.

 

e.g. Find the product of 96 and 32.

 

Answer:

Long multiplication 96 x 32

 

We get the answer by adding the red and blue rows together.

The answer is 3072.

 

 

Want to understand this further and learn how this links to other topics in maths?


Why not watch this video?

 

 

Find the product of 96 and 52.

Find the product of 84 and 94.

Find the product of 34 and 86.

Find the product of 96 and 34.

Find the product of 50 and 94.

Find the product of 95 and 35.

Find the product of 54 and 27.

Find the product of 33 and 59.

Find the product of 87 and 34.

Find the product of 48 and 75.

  • Question 1

Find the product of 96 and 52.

CORRECT ANSWER
4992
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 96 x 2 = 192 Step 2. Multiply 96 x 50 = 4800 Step 3. Add 192 + 4800 = 4992
  • Question 2

Find the product of 84 and 94.

CORRECT ANSWER
7896
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 84 x 4 = 336 Step 2. Multiply 84 x 90 = 7560 Step 3. Add 336 + 7560 = 7896
  • Question 3

Find the product of 34 and 86.

CORRECT ANSWER
2924
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 34 x 6 = 204 Step 2. Multiply 34 x 80 = 2720 Step 3. Add 204 + 2720 = 2924
  • Question 4

Find the product of 96 and 34.

CORRECT ANSWER
3264
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 96 x 4 = 384 Step 2. Multiply 96 x 30 = 2880 Step 3. Add 384 + 2880 = 3264
  • Question 5

Find the product of 50 and 94.

CORRECT ANSWER
4700
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 50 x 4 = 200 Step 2. Multiply 50 x 90 = 4500 Step 3. Add 200 + 4500 = 4700
  • Question 6

Find the product of 95 and 35.

CORRECT ANSWER
3325
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 95 x 5 = 475 Step 2. Multiply 95 x 30 = 2850 Step 3. Add 475 + 2850 = 3325
  • Question 7

Find the product of 54 and 27.

CORRECT ANSWER
1458
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 54 x 7 = 378 Step 2. Multiply 54 x 20 = 1080 Step 3. Add 378 + 1080 = 1458
  • Question 8

Find the product of 33 and 59.

CORRECT ANSWER
1947
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 33 x 9 = 297 Step 2. Multiply 33 x 50 = 1650 Step 3. Add 297 + 1650 = 1947
  • Question 9

Find the product of 87 and 34.

CORRECT ANSWER
2958
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 87 x 4 = 348 Step 2. Multiply 87 x 30 = 2610 Step 3. Add 348 + 2610 = 2958
  • Question 10

Find the product of 48 and 75.

CORRECT ANSWER
3600
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1. Multiply 48 x 5 = 240 Step 2. Multiply 48 x 70 = 3360 Step 3. Add 240 + 3360 = 3600
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started
laptop

Start your £1 trial today.
Subscribe from £10/month.