The smart way to improve grades

Comprehensive & curriculum aligned

Affordable pricing from £10/month

Multiply Using the Grid Method

In this worksheet, students will practise multiplication, with two numbers of up to three-digits, using the grid method.

'Multiply Using the Grid Method' worksheet

Key stage:  KS 4

GCSE Subjects:   Maths

GCSE Boards:   Pearson Edexcel, OCR, Eduqas, AQA

Curriculum topic:   Number, Number Operations and Integers

Curriculum subtopic:   Structure and Calculation, Calculations with Integers

Difficulty level:  

Worksheet Overview

QUESTION 1 of 10

There are a number of methods for multiplying two numbers together.

One that is very popular (even if it's a bit slower than other methods) is the grid method.

 

 

e.g. Calculate 36 x 25.

 

Step 1: Split the numbers up.  ->  36 = 30 + 6 and 25 = 20 + 5

 

Step 2: Create a grid and put the numbers around the outside.

 

  30 6
20    
5    

 

 

Step 3: For each of the spaces in the grid, multiply the number on the top by the number on the left side.

 

  30 6
20 600 120
5 150 30

 

 

Step 4: Add all these numbers together.

 

600
+   120
+   150
+     30
900

 

 

 

Before you start this activity, make sure you have a pen and paper handy so that you can create your own grids as we go. 

 

Let's get started!

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

2 x 43

Imagine that you had calculated an answer to the sum below by creating this grid: 

 

7 x 21 = 21

 

  20 1
7 14 7

 

How do you know that this answer cannot be correct?

 

This cannot be correct because the answer is too...

..high

...low

Which of the numbers in this grid calculation is incorrect?

 

8 x 48

 

  40 8
8 32 640
32

640

Both of them

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

36 x 22

Which of the following answers in this grid multiplication is incorrect?

 

17 x 94

 

  10 7
90 900 63
4 40 28

Use the grid method on you own piece of paper to calculate:

 

83 x 55

If we use the grid method to calculate:

 

27 x 413

 

How big should we draw the grid?

2 x 2

3 x 2

2 x 3

3 x 3

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

28 x 312

Imagine you have solved the calculation below by creating this grid: 

 

374 x 218

 

  300 70 4
200 60000 14000 80
10 30000 700 40
8 2400 5600 32

 

Select if each of the answers in your grid is correct or incorrect in the table below.

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

925 x 412

  • Question 1

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

2 x 43

CORRECT ANSWER
86
EDDIE SAYS
Did your grid look like this?
  40 3
2 80 6
If so, then you final calculation is: 80 + 6 = 86 How did you find this first grid? Shall we make it a little more challenging?
  • Question 2

Imagine that you had calculated an answer to the sum below by creating this grid: 

 

7 x 21 = 21

 

  20 1
7 14 7

 

How do you know that this answer cannot be correct?

 

This cannot be correct because the answer is too...

CORRECT ANSWER
...low
EDDIE SAYS
Remember, if we have a 1 digit number by a 2 digit number, our answer should be 3 digits. 21 is too small. It should have been 140 in the first square! The second square was correct. The correct answer is therefore: 140 + 7 = 147
  • Question 3

Which of the numbers in this grid calculation is incorrect?

 

8 x 48

 

  40 8
8 32 640
CORRECT ANSWER
Both of them
EDDIE SAYS
This was a trick question - sorry! Both numbers are incorrect. 8 x 40 should be 320 and 8 x 8 should be 64. If we add these together, the correct answer is 672.
  • Question 4

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

36 x 22

CORRECT ANSWER
792
EDDIE SAYS
Did your grid look something like this?
  30 6
20 600 120
2 60 12
This time we need to add 4 numbers: 600 + 120 + 60 + 12 = 792
  • Question 5

Which of the following answers in this grid multiplication is incorrect?

 

17 x 94

 

  10 7
90 900 63
4 40 28
CORRECT ANSWER
63
EDDIE SAYS
Did you spot it? Doesn't 63 in the right-hand box of the top row look a little small? 7 x 90 is not 63, it is 630!
  • Question 6

Use the grid method on you own piece of paper to calculate:

 

83 x 55

CORRECT ANSWER
4565
EDDIE SAYS
Good effort! Your grid should look like this:
  80 3
50 4000 150
5 400 15
If we add these 4 numbers together, we get: 4000 + 150 + 400 + 15 = 4565 Could you do this calculation in your head? It is much quicker if you can do this step mentally to save time in exams.
  • Question 7

If we use the grid method to calculate:

 

27 x 413

 

How big should we draw the grid?

CORRECT ANSWER
3 x 2
2 x 3
EDDIE SAYS
Don't worry if you found that tricky. We have a 2-digit and a 3-digit number, so we need to have either a 2 x 3 or a 3 x 2. It doesn't matter which way round we go for - that's completely up to you!
  • Question 8

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

28 x 312

CORRECT ANSWER
8756
EDDIE SAYS
Did your grid look like this?
  20 8
300 6000 2400
10 200 80
2 60 16
Let's add all the numbers together now: 6000 + 2400 + 200 + 80 + 60 + 16 = 8756
  • Question 9

Imagine you have solved the calculation below by creating this grid: 

 

374 x 218

 

  300 70 4
200 60000 14000 80
10 30000 700 40
8 2400 5600 32

 

Select if each of the answers in your grid is correct or incorrect in the table below.

CORRECT ANSWER
EDDIE SAYS
How did you do? The simplest way to check if an answer is correct is to count the zeros. For example: 4 x 200 has two zeros in the question, so should have 2 in the answer. Which it does not! Accurately employing place value rules is an essential skill for success when using the grid method.
  • Question 10

Use the grid method on your own piece of paper to calculate:

 

925 x 412

CORRECT ANSWER
381100
EDDIE SAYS
Your grid should look like this:
  900 20 5
400 360000 8000 2000
10 9000 200 50
2 1800 40 10
If you add all the numbers together, you get: 360000 + 8000 + 2000 + 9000 + 200 + 50 + 1800 + 40 + 10 = 381,100 There are lots of complex numbers to add together here, so it may help to write this out on paper. Well done on completing this activity! If you found it challenging, why not revise place value in more detail?
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started
laptop

Start your £1 trial today.
Subscribe from £10/month.