Multiply Two Three-Digit Numbers

In this worksheet, student multiply two three-digit numbers using a column method.

Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:   Maths and Numerical Reasoning

Curriculum subtopic:   Mixed Problems

Difficulty level:

QUESTION 1 of 10

In this worksheet, we will learn how to multiply together two three-digit numbers using a column method.

For Example:

Find the product of 333 and 421.

 × 333 421 333 × 400 133200 333 × 20 6660 333 × 1 333 140193

Find this product

989 × 537 = _______

Find this product

411 × 395 = _______

Find this product

296 × 727 = _______

Find this product

360 × 143 = _______

Find this product

287 × 665 = _______

Find this product

296 × 565 = _______

Find this product

439 × 582 = _______

Work out the value of

228 × 249 = _______

Work out

660 × 795 = _______

Work out the product of 809 and 547

809 × 547 = _______

• Question 1

Find this product

989 × 537 = _______

531093
• Question 2

Find this product

411 × 395 = _______

162345
• Question 3

Find this product

296 × 727 = _______

215192
• Question 4

Find this product

360 × 143 = _______

51480
• Question 5

Find this product

287 × 665 = _______

190855
• Question 6

Find this product

296 × 565 = _______

167240
• Question 7

Find this product

439 × 582 = _______

255498
• Question 8

Work out the value of

228 × 249 = _______

56772
• Question 9

Work out

660 × 795 = _______

524700
• Question 10

Work out the product of 809 and 547

809 × 547 = _______

442523
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started