The smart way to improve grades

Comprehensive & curriculum aligned

Affordable pricing from £10/month

Multiply Two-Digit Numbers by Three-Digit Numbers

In this worksheet, students practise multiplying a two-digit number by a three-digit number using a column method.

'Multiply Two-Digit Numbers by Three-Digit Numbers' worksheet

Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:   Number: Addition, Subtraction, Multiplication and Division

Curriculum subtopic:   Multiply to Four Digits (Long Multiplication)

Difficulty level:  

Worksheet Overview

QUESTION 1 of 10

In this worksheet, we will learn how to multiply a two-digit number by a three-digit number.

 

For Example:

Question:

Find the product of 85 and 714

  × 85
714
   
85 × 700 59500
85 × 10 850
85 × 4 340
   
  60690
 

 

This method may not be the most efficient but it is good preparation for harder three-digit examples.

Find this product

93 × 257 = _______

Find this product

80 × 157 = _______

Find this product

31 × 616 = _______

Find this product

11 × 432 = _______

Find this product

15 × 399 = _______

Find this product

87 × 132 = _______

Work out

40 × 533 = _______

Find this product

62 × 882 = _______

Work out

79 × 258 = _______

Find the product of 51 and 980.

51 × 980 = _______

  • Question 1

Find this product

93 × 257 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
23901
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 93 x 200 = 18600 Step 2: 93 x 50 = 4650 Step 3: 93 x 7 = 651 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 23901.
  • Question 2

Find this product

80 × 157 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
12560
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 80 x 100 = 8000 Step 2: 80 x 50 = 4000 Step 3: 80 x 7 = 560 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 12560.
  • Question 3

Find this product

31 × 616 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
19096
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 31 x 600 = 18600 Step 2: 31 x 10 = 310 Step 3: 31 x 6 = 186 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 19096.
  • Question 4

Find this product

11 × 432 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
4752
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 11 x 400 = 4400 Step 2: 11 x 30 = 330 Step 3: 11 x 2 = 22 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 4752.
  • Question 5

Find this product

15 × 399 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
5985
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 15 x 300 = 4500 Step 2: 15 x 90 = 1350 Step 3: 15 x 9 = 135 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 5985.
  • Question 6

Find this product

87 × 132 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
11484
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 87 x 100 = 8700 Step 2: 87 x 30 = 2610 Step 3: 87 x 2 = 174 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 11484.
  • Question 7

Work out

40 × 533 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
21320
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 40 x 500 = 20000 Step 2: 40 x 30 = 1200 Step 3: 40 x 3 = 120 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 21320.
  • Question 8

Find this product

62 × 882 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
54684
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 62 x 800 = 49600 Step 2: 62 x 80 = 4960 Step 3: 62 x 2 = 124 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 54684.
  • Question 9

Work out

79 × 258 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
20382
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 79 x 200 = 15800 Step 2: 79 x 50 = 3950 Step 3: 79 x 8 = 632 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 20382.
  • Question 10

Find the product of 51 and 980.

51 × 980 = _______

CORRECT ANSWER
49980
EDDIE SAYS
Step 1: 51 x 900 = 45900 Step 2: 51 x 80 = 4080 Step 3: 51 x 0 = 0 Step 4: Add steps 1 to 3 to get the answer 49980.
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started
laptop

Start your £1 trial today.
Subscribe from £10/month.