The smart way to improve grades

Comprehensive & curriculum aligned

Affordable pricing from £10/month

Multiply a Three-Digit Number by a Two-Digit Number

In this worksheet, students use long multiplication to find the product of a three-digit number and a two-digit number.

'Multiply a Three-Digit Number by a Two-Digit Number' worksheet

Key stage:  KS 2

Curriculum topic:  Number: Addition, Subtraction, Multiplication and Division

Curriculum subtopic:  Multiply to Four Digits (Long Multiplication)

Difficulty level:  

Worksheet Overview

QUESTION 1 of 10

In this worksheet, we will learn how to multiply a three-digit number by a two-digit number.

 

Example

Work out

382 × 74

 

Answer

Split 74 into 4 and 70.

 

In the first line, we multiply 385 by 4.

In the second line, we multiply 385 by 70.

 

Then we add the two results to get the final answer of 28490.

 

See how it is set out in the long multiplication below.

 

  × 385
74
   
385 × 4 1540
385 × 70 26950
   
  28490
 

Find this product:

 

257 × 93

Find this product:

 

157 × 81

Find this product:

 

616 × 31

Find this product:

 

432 × 11

Find this product:

 

399 × 32

Find this product:

 

132 × 87

Find this product:

 

533 × 41

Find this product:

 

882 × 62

Find this product:

 

258 × 79

Find this product:

 

980 × 51

  • Question 1

Find this product:

 

257 × 93

CORRECT ANSWER
23901
EDDIE SAYS
257 ×   3 =     771
257 × 90 = 23130
Add to get 23901.
  • Question 2

Find this product:

 

157 × 81

CORRECT ANSWER
12717
EDDIE SAYS
157 × 1 = 157
157 × 80 = 12560
Add to get 12717.
  • Question 3

Find this product:

 

616 × 31

CORRECT ANSWER
19096
EDDIE SAYS
616 × 1 = 616
616 × 30 = 18480
Add to get 19096.
  • Question 4

Find this product:

 

432 × 11

CORRECT ANSWER
4752
EDDIE SAYS
432 × 1 = 432
432 × 10 = 4320
Add to get 4752.
  • Question 5

Find this product:

 

399 × 32

CORRECT ANSWER
12768
EDDIE SAYS
399 × 2 = 798
399 × 30 = 11970
Add to get 12768.
  • Question 6

Find this product:

 

132 × 87

CORRECT ANSWER
11484
EDDIE SAYS
132 × 7 = 924
132 × 80 = 10560
Add to get 11484.
  • Question 7

Find this product:

 

533 × 41

CORRECT ANSWER
21853
EDDIE SAYS
533 × 1 = 533
533 × 40 = 21320
Add to get 21853.
  • Question 8

Find this product:

 

882 × 62

CORRECT ANSWER
54684
EDDIE SAYS
882 × 2 = 1764
882 × 60 = 52920
Add to get 54684.
  • Question 9

Find this product:

 

258 × 79

CORRECT ANSWER
20382
EDDIE SAYS
258 × 9 = 2322
258 × 70 = 18060
Add to get 20382.
  • Question 10

Find this product:

 

980 × 51

CORRECT ANSWER
49980
EDDIE SAYS
980 × 1 = 980
980 × 50 = 49000
Add to get 49980.
---- OR ----

Sign up for a £1 trial so you can track and measure your child's progress on this activity.

What is EdPlace?

We're your National Curriculum aligned online education content provider helping each child succeed in English, maths and science from year 1 to GCSE. With an EdPlace account you’ll be able to track and measure progress, helping each child achieve their best. We build confidence and attainment by personalising each child’s learning at a level that suits them.

Get started
laptop

Start your £1 trial today.
Subscribe from £10/month.